Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 45 Today
» 1000 Yesterday
» 1970 Week
» 19306 Month
» 297102 Year
» 1181483 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 92200   30/11/1958

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 9F
Company History BR
Wheels 2-10-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Sun 30/11/1958 to Doncaster (36A)
Withdrawal w/e Sun 03/10/1965
Scrapping During 12/1965 at T W Ward (Killamarsh)
Service Life 6 yrs, 10 mths , 3 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
36A Doncaster (New) 30/11/1958
40B Immingham w/e 14/09/1963
36A Doncaster w/e 20/06/1964
41J Langwith Junction w/e 19/06/1965
   Withdrawn w/e 03/10/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 36A Doncaster 18/11/1958
ALLOC 40B Immingham 6w/e 05/10/1963
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 3w/e 04/07/1964
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 2w/e 26/06/1965
WDN   w/e 03/10/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
30/11/1958 To Service To service as BR Number 92200
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Doncaster (36A)
   
14/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
20/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
19/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
10/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 92200    
12/1965 Scrapped Broken up by T W Ward: Killamarsh    

prev