Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 597 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 6202 Week
» 17749 Month
» 417431 Year
» 494018 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 92203   30/04/1959

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Riddles
Class Standard Class 9F
Company History BR
Wheels 2-10-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Tue 30/04/1959 to St Philips Marsh (82B)
Withdrawal During 11/1967 off Birkenhead Mollington Street (8H)
Service Life 8 yrs, 6 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
82B St Philips Marsh (New) 30/04/1959
81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 08/10/1960
84C Banbury w/e 30/03/1963
8H Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 17/09/1966
   Withdrawn m/e 11/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 18/04/1959
NEW NYA   m/e 30/04/1959
ALLOC 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 05/10/1960
ALLOC 84C Banbury 4w/e 30/03/1963
ALLOC 84C Banbury 4w/e 06/04/1963
ALLOC 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street 4w/e 08/10/1966
LOAN 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street 5w/e 08/04/1967
WDN 8C Speke Junction w/e 11/11/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Preservation Date 11/1967
Current Status Operational
Information The artist, David Shepperd, a familiar face with his canvas at many a southern depot, wanted to save a locomotive for posterity. He contacted BR and was offered a 9F still in stock at Birkenhead - it was withdrawn and handed over to Mr Shepherd for the 'Prince'ly sum of 3,000, working under it's own steam to the Longmoor Military Railway in Hampshire.
Link www.eastsomersetrailway.com/stock.php?num=92203
Status Date 23/06/2011


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
30/04/1959 To Service To service as BR Number 92203
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)
   
08/10/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
30/03/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Banbury (84C)    
17/09/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (8H)    
11/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 92203 from Birkenhead Mollington Street (8H)    

prev prev