Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 748 Today
» 1058 Yesterday
» 5322 Week
» 33280 Month
» 67922 Year
» 1289487 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 92204   30/04/1959

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 9F
Company History BR
Wheels 2-10-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Sat 30/04/1959 to St Philips Marsh (82B)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 09/12/1967
Scrapping During 03/1968 at T W Ward (Beighton)
Service Life 8 yrs, 7 mths , 9 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
82B St Philips Marsh (New) 30/04/1959
81C Southall 4w/e 08/10/1960
81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 05/11/1960
84C Banbury w/e 30/03/1963
2A Tyseley w/e 14/09/1963
8C Speke Junction w/e 20/08/1966
   Withdrawn w/e 09/12/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW NYA   m/e 30/04/1959
1STALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 16/05/1959
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 05/10/1960
ALLOC 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 05/11/1960
ALLOC 84C Banbury 4w/e 30/03/1963
ALLOC 84C Banbury 4w/e 06/04/1963
ALLOC 2A Tyseley 5w/e 12/10/1963
ALLOC 8C Speke Junction 5w/e 10/09/1966
WDN 8C Speke Junction w/e 09/12/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
30/04/1959 To Service To service as BR Number 92204
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)
   
08/10/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
05/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
30/03/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Banbury (84C)    
14/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Tyseley (2A)    
20/08/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C)    
12/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 92204    
03/1968 Scrapped Broken up by T W Ward: Beighton    

prev prev