Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 26 Online
» 1061 Today
» 1086 Yesterday
» 6659 Week
» 29165 Month
» 332355 Year
» 1553920 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 92207 on 01/06/1959

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 9F
Company History BR
Wheels 2-10-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Sat 01/06/1959 to St Philips Marsh (82B)
Withdrawal Sat 26/12/1964
Service Life 5 yrs, 6 mths , 25 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
82B St Philips Marsh (New) on 01/06/1959
81C Southall 4w/e 27/02/1960
86B Ebbw Junction (Newport) w/e 22/11/1964
   Withdrawn on 26/12/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
1STALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 13/06/1959
NEW NYA   m/e 30/06/1959
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 27/02/1960
ALLOC 86B Ebbw Junction (Newport) 2w/e 28/11/1964
WDN   5w/e 04/01/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/06/1959 Diagram BR9 boiler fitted (number BR9-1882)

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/06/1959 To Service To service as British Railways Number 92207
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)
Diagram BR9 boiler fitted
   
27/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
22/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86B)    
26/12/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 92207    

prev prev