Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 425 Today
» 1085 Yesterday
» 425 Week
» 22931 Month
» 326121 Year
» 1547686 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 92208 on 11/06/1959

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 9F
Company History BR
Wheels 2-10-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Sat 11/06/1959 to Laira (83D)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 28/10/1967
Scrapping Wed 28/02/1968 at J McWilliams (Shettleston)
Service Life 8 yrs, 4 mths , 17 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
83D Laira (New) on 11/06/1959
81C Southall 4w/e 26/03/1960
88A Cardiff Canton 4w/e 02/12/1961
88L Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 08/09/1962
9D Newton Heath on 06/10/1963
12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 27/06/1964
   Withdrawn w/e 28/10/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
1STALLOC 83D Laira 4w/e 13/06/1959
NEW NYA   m/e 30/06/1959
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 26/03/1960
ALLOC 88A Cardiff Canton 4w/e 02/12/1961
ALLOC 88L Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 08/09/1962
ALLOC 9D Newton Heath 5w/e 12/10/1963
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region 5w/e 02/11/1963
ALLOC 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 5w/e 11/07/1964
WDN 12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 28/10/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
16/01/1966 Crewe Works (Waiting Works) Erecting shop: 44834/856, 45073/212/87/318. 45593 (repaint), 48340/723, 70005/11/40/5, 92013/32/71/90, D238, D249, D275, D296, D315/31/2/78/81, D1508/31/47/9/98, D1692, D1710, D8012 and D1991-1999, D1100; Electric shop: E3014/41/9/67, E26020/43, E27001; 'new' shop: D1533, D1617/36/81, D1754, D1803, D1970. Traverser area: D214, D243/92, D399, D5706/15/6, D8005, D1500/3/41/6/80, D160/83/94. 01700/51/64, D1840; Test area: D243/4, D1527/35/61/82. Old Cutting-up shop: D1515/73, D1788, D8016, E3045, D257. Waiting Works: 45350, 48683, 92020/208. Paint shop: 46235 (inside), D245, D252, D380, D1579, D1985-1990, D5709, 44871, 70051, 92107, 71000 (stored). SLS/196602
27/02/1966 Crewe Works (Erecting shop) Erecting shop: 44794, 44848, 44900, 45044/80, 45130, 45268/84/92, 48010/317, 92026/87/93, 92208/33, D220/3/41/83/99, D338, D1551/66/75/86, D1603/11/97, D1707/33, D1996-9, D1100-4, D5706, D8010/6; Electric shop: E3037/41/5/67/168, 26013/34/53, 27003; New Diesel shop: D243/70, D352/3/90, D1507/15/21/3/7, D1646/89/778, D1910/75; Works yard: D209, D1599, D1720, 45493, 48037/121, 70038; Traverser area: D272/8, D1503/17/24, D1675, D1863, D1914/71, D5715, E3049; On Test: D313/80/99, D1528/45/58, D1683, D1741/6, D8008; Paint shop: D259, D331, D1991-5, D292/6, D5709, D8050, E3102, 45096, 48062/3, 92020 and stored 46235, 71000. SLS/196604

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/06/1959 To Service To service as British Railways Number 92208
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Laira (83D)
   
26/03/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
02/12/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (88A)    
08/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88L)    
06/10/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D)    
27/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    
28/10/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 92208    

prev prev