|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
28/11/1959 | Banbury MPD | With the increased traffic occasioned by the transfer of Wolverhampton-Birmingham-London trains from the LMR, this shed has acquired three Castles viz. 4078, 5057 an 7011 i.e. including Banbury Castle. Crewe's last steam engine (92250) has been transferred away to Newport (86A) but additional 9Fs ex Swindon Works have been allocated viz. 92211/2/3. | SLS/196001 |
04/11/1961 | Eastleigh Works (Works Yard) | Erecting Shop: D5000/3, D6530, E5008, 3733, 7782, 9629/77, 15211/34, 30051/7, 30480, 30543/7, 30830, 30921, 31808, 32343, 33028/33/40, 34015/49/57/63, 34103/10, 35010/27, 41206, 41324, 73020, 76059, 80145, 82013. Works Yard: 9732, 15233, 30120, 30859/, 34037/50/99, 76060/8, 92211. Scrap Yard: 30277, 30858, 31145, 31505. | SLS/196112 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/09/1959 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 92211 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
||
17/06/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Westbury (82D) | ||
23/08/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) | ||
02/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) | ||
24/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Feltham (70B) | ||
08/09/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
05/11/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) | ||
22/05/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 92211 | ||
12/1967 | Scrapped | Broken up by Drapers: Hull |