Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 404 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 2850 Week
» 14555 Month
» 346044 Year
» 422631 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 92214   31/10/1959

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Riddles
Class Standard Class 9F
Company History BR
Wheels 2-10-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Tue 31/10/1959 to Cardiff Canton (86C)
Withdrawal During 09/1965
Service Life 5 yrs , 10 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
86C Cardiff Canton (New) 31/10/1959
84C Banbury 4w/e 28/11/1959
86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 02/12/1961
86B Ebbw Junction (Newport) 7w/e 22/06/1964
86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 20/07/1964
   Withdrawn m/e 09/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW NYA   m/e 31/10/1959
1STALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 31/10/1959
1STALLOC 84C Banbury 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 02/12/1961
ALLOC 82F Bath Green Park (S&D) 2w/e 16/05/1964
ALLOC 86B Ebbw Junction (Newport) 3w/e 29/06/1964
ALLOC 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 3w/e 20/07/1964
WDN   06/08/1965
TOSTORE   4w/e 08/08/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
31/10/1959 To Service To service as BR Number 92214
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)
   
28/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Banbury (84C)    
02/12/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A)    
22/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86B)    
20/07/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E)    
09/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 92214    

prev prev