Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 72 Today
» 1240 Yesterday
» 4929 Week
» 16634 Month
» 348123 Year
» 424710 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 92219   31/01/1960

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Riddles
Class Standard Class 9F
Company History BR
Wheels 2-10-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Tue 31/01/1960 to Cardiff Canton (86C)
Withdrawal During 09/1965
Service Life 5 yrs , 7 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
86C Cardiff Canton (New) 31/01/1960
88L Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 08/09/1962
   Withdrawn m/e 09/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 30/01/1960
NEW NYA   m/e 31/01/1960
ALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 27/02/1960
ALLOC 88L Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 08/09/1962
TOSTORE   4w/e 11/07/1965
WDN   06/08/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unserviceable
Information Currently in a stripped condition at Leeming Bar on the Wensleydale Railway. It may be being used as a source of spares (thanks to Keith Chesworth for the update)
Status Date 29/05/2017


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
31/01/1960 To Service To service as BR Number 92219
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)
   
08/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88L)    
09/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 92219    

prev prev