Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 423 Today
» 1085 Yesterday
» 423 Week
» 22929 Month
» 326119 Year
» 1547684 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 92222 on 02/06/1958

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 9F
Company History BR
Wheels 2-10-0
Builder Crewe Works
To Service Fri 02/06/1958 to Banbury (84C)
Withdrawal Fri 26/03/1965
Scrapping During 07/1965 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 6 yrs, 9 mths , 24 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
84C Banbury (New) on 02/06/1958
83D Laira 4w/e 11/07/1959
84C Banbury 4w/e 26/03/1960
83D Laira 4w/e 18/06/1960
86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 05/11/1960
87A Neath (Court Sart) 4w/e 30/11/1963
81C Southall 6w/e 12/10/1964
   Withdrawn on 26/03/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 84C Banbury m/e 30/06/1958
1STALLOC 83D Laira 4w/e 11/07/1959
ALLOC 84C Banbury 4w/e 26/03/1960
ALLOC 83D Laira 4w/e 18/06/1960
ALLOC 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 05/11/1960
ALLOC 87A Neath (Court Sart) 4w/e 30/11/1963
ALLOC 81C Southall 3w/e 14/09/1964
WDN   5w/e 12/04/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
04/03/1962 Swindon Works ('A' Shop) Triangle: 1435, 3636, 4123/6, 4929, 5167, 5509/11/49, 6152/3/66, 6348, 7421, 7796, 8441, 8700/79, 9738. Works Yard: D3437, 1009/21/7, 3809/49, 4093, 4632, 4905/44, 5924, 6006, 6408, 6820, 6965/7, 7002/4/27/37, 7306, 8489/94, 8721/33/62/75, 9460, 9765. Weigh House: 5967. 'C' Shop: 8735, 9416. Dump: 1642, 2205/6/30/88, 4207, 5069, 5770, 7771/2, 8451, 8768, 9454/74, 9720. 'A' Shop: D600/2/3, D808, D1002-17, D2182-6, D3035, D3354/6/60/6/97, D3425, D4009, D6315/23/37, 8, 1013/5/9/28, 2516, 2859/73/6, 3440, 4003, 4286, 4920/50, 5026/43/56, 5990/1, 6012, 6821/7/39, 6906/13/36/50/71/3/93, 7001/3/6/13/26, 7226, 7320/37, 7918, 9400, 82040, 92222/37. SLS/196204

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/06/1958 To Service To service as British Railways Number 92222
Built at Crewe Works
Allocated to Banbury (84C)
   
11/07/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (83D)    
26/03/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Banbury (84C)    
18/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (83D)    
05/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A)    
30/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A)    
12/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
26/03/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 92222    

prev prev