Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 819 Today
» 1058 Yesterday
» 5393 Week
» 33351 Month
» 67993 Year
» 1289558 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 92226   30/06/1958

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 9F
Company History BR
Wheels 2-10-0
Builder Crewe Works
To Service Fri 30/06/1958 to Banbury (84C)
Withdrawal Fri 10/09/1965
Scrapping During 12/1965 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 7 yrs, 2 mths , 11 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
84C Banbury (New) 30/06/1958
81C Southall 4w/e 16/07/1960
86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 05/11/1960
81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 04/11/1961
86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 03/11/1962
86B Ebbw Junction (Newport) 7w/e 22/06/1964
86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 20/07/1964
86B Ebbw Junction (Newport) 2w/e 01/11/1964
86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 11/07/1965
   Withdrawn 10/09/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW NYA   m/e 30/06/1958
ALLOC 84C Banbury 4w/e 12/07/1958
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 16/07/1960
ALLOC 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 05/11/1960
ALLOC 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 04/11/1961
ALLOC 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 03/11/1962
ALLOC 82F Bath Green Park (S&D) 2w/e 16/05/1964
ALLOC 86B Ebbw Junction (Newport) 3w/e 29/06/1964
ALLOC 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 3w/e 20/07/1964
ALLOC 86B Ebbw Junction (Newport) 3w/e 02/11/1964
ALLOC 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 11/07/1965
WDN   10/09/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
30/06/1958 To Service To service as BR Number 92226
Built at Crewe Works
Allocated to Banbury (84C)
   
16/07/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
05/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A)    
04/11/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
03/11/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A)    
22/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86B)    
20/07/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E)    
01/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86B)    
11/07/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E)    
09/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 92226    
12/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev