Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 516 Today
» 1081 Yesterday
» 2631 Week
» 25137 Month
» 328327 Year
» 1549892 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 92229 on 18/07/1958

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 9F
Company History BR
Wheels 2-10-0
Builder Crewe Works
To Service Fri 18/07/1958
Withdrawal Fri 06/11/1964
Scrapping During 02/1965 at Cox and Danks (North Acton)
Service Life 6 yrs, 3 mths , 19 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) on 18/07/1958
84C Banbury 4w/e 09/08/1958
81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 01/11/1958
86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 30/01/1960
81C Southall 4w/e 30/11/1963
86B Ebbw Junction (Newport) 7w/e 22/06/1964
   Withdrawn on 06/11/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW NYA   m/e 31/07/1958
1STALLOC 84C Banbury 4w/e 09/08/1958
ALLOC 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 01/11/1958
ALLOC 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 30/01/1960
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 30/11/1963
ALLOC 86B Ebbw Junction (Newport) 3w/e 29/06/1964
WDN   w/e 09/11/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
29/10/1961 Caerphilly Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: 1420/71, 1506, 1651/68 3702, 4242/65/79/98, 5232, 5618, 6115/45, 6684, 8464/9/86, 9420/57, 9671, 9710, 92221/9. Works Yard: 3682, 3797, 4690, 6108, 9489, 9639, 92238. SLS/196112

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
18/07/1958 To Service To service as British Railways Number 92229
Built at Crewe Works
   
09/08/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Banbury (84C)    
01/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
30/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A)    
30/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
22/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86B)    
06/11/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 92229    

prev prev