Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 90 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 1124 Week
» 23630 Month
» 326820 Year
» 1548385 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 92240 on 01/10/1958

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 9F
Company History BR
Wheels 2-10-0
Builder Crewe Works
To Service Fri 01/10/1958 to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A)
Withdrawal Fri 06/08/1965
Service Life 6 yrs, 10 mths , 5 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) (New) on 01/10/1958
81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 29/11/1958
81C Southall 4w/e 10/09/1960
   Withdrawn on 06/08/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) m/e 31/10/1958
ALLOC 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 29/11/1958
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 10/09/1960
WDN   on 06/08/1965
TOSTORE   4w/e 08/08/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/10/1958 To Service To service as British Railways Number 92240
Built at Crewe Works
Allocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A)
   
29/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
10/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
06/08/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 92240    

prev prev