Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 543 Today
» 1081 Yesterday
» 2658 Week
» 25164 Month
» 328354 Year
» 1549919 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 92241 on 06/10/1958

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 9F
Company History BR
Wheels 2-10-0
Builder Crewe Works
To Service Fri 06/10/1958 to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A)
Withdrawal Fri 02/07/1965
Scrapping During 09/1965 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 6 yrs, 8 mths , 26 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) (New) on 06/10/1958
81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 29/11/1958
88A Cardiff Canton 4w/e 05/11/1960
88L Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 08/09/1962
81C Southall 4w/e 30/11/1963
   Withdrawn on 02/07/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW NYA   m/e 31/10/1958
1STALLOC 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 01/11/1958
ALLOC 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 29/11/1958
ALLOC 86C Hereford 4w/e 05/11/1960
ALLOC 88L Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 08/09/1962
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 30/11/1963
WDN   on 02/07/1965
WDN   4w/e 11/07/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
17/09/1961 Swindon Works (Works Sidings) 'A' Shop: D604, D816/7/21/3/5/43/70, D3431, D6306/8/21, 2866, 3852, 4003/79/81/7/9, D1000-11, D2379-83, 4117, 4707, 4904/26/33/43/66/79/92/8, 5018/38/74/92, 5208, 5380, 6021/6, 6808/16/25/32/4/40, 6948, 7018/28, 7219, 7825, 7905/21, 13115/84/6, 13259/65, 92215/26. Works Sidings: D820, D2086, D2143/4, D2378, D7000, 1009, 3670, 3839/59, 4100, 4917/8/83, 5000/78, 5951/98, 6014/6/9/27, 6964/87/96, 7200, 7756/75, 7909, 8721, 9400, 9749, 73027, 78008, 92241/5. Triangle: 1640, 5087, 5198, 5516, 5934/75, 8762/72/87, 9751, 13355. Dump: 1361/6, 1433, 1604, 5318, 6720, 7745/98, 8429, 8740/74/7/89, 9735/6/67. 'C' Shop: 4203, 5110/95. Outside Stock Shed: D806, D4025, D6303, 4948, 5815, 6900. Weigh House : Nil. Outside Weigh House: D801. Gasworks : Nil. SLS/196111
12/11/1961 Swindon Works ('A' Shop) 'A' Shop: D603, D825/32/56, D1000-12, D2175-7, D2383/4, D3032, D6320, 1010/15/24, 2832, 4003/82/92/5, 4706, 4903/18/32/76/89, 5073/8/87/96/8, 5974/6, 6014/26/8, 6345, 6826/45, 6909/33/55/81, 7015/21/2/34, 7232, 7322 (being cut up), 7805, 7915, 9400, 13115, 13353/5/62, 15100, 73027, 82004/35, 92233/41/5. Works Sidings: L90, 8, 1006/23, 2215, 3838/9, 4075/83, 4207, 4945, 5071, 5950/98, 6019, 6309/29/38, 6820, 6915/64, 7002, 7901/17, 8787, 9705, 75005, 78008, 92212. Triangle: 1606/15, 4563/5, 5039, 5538, 6415, 6993, 7417, 7787, 8772, 9739. Dump: 1433, 5332, 6700, 8706, 9745/9. 'C' Shop: 6392, 7775 intact. Outside Stock Shed: 5815, 6357, 6900. Weigh House: 5938/55. Outside Weigh House: D831/53, D6303, D7010. Works Shunters: 5756/80, 7756, 8721/62. SLS/196201

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/10/1958 To Service To service as British Railways Number 92241
Built at Crewe Works
Allocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A)
   
29/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
05/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (88A)    
08/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88L)    
30/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
02/07/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 92241    

prev prev