Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 1005 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 7394 Week
» 27836 Month
» 364682 Year
» 1586247 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 92242 on 13/10/1958

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 9F
Company History BR
Wheels 2-10-0
Builder Crewe Works
To Service Sun 13/10/1958 to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A)
Withdrawal 4w/e Sun 13/06/1965
Scrapping During 08/1965 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 6 yrs , 8 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) (New) on 13/10/1958
86E Severn Tunnel Junction 2w/e 01/11/1964
   Withdrawn 4w/e 13/06/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW NYA   m/e 31/10/1958
1STALLOC 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 01/11/1958
ALLOC 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 3w/e 02/11/1964
WDN   4w/e 13/06/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
13/10/1958 To Service To service as British Railways Number 92242
Built at Crewe Works
Allocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A)
   
01/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E)    
13/06/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 92242    

prev prev