Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 3083 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16489 Week
» 69505 Month
» 189032 Year
» 3215885 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
92243 |
on |
21/10/1958 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/10/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 92243 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) |
|
|
17/11/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
28/09/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88A) |
|
|
08/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E) |
|
|
07/02/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88A) |
|
|
08/08/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86B) |
|
|
07/11/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (82E) |
|
|
31/12/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 92243 |
|
|
04/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|