Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 4056 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17462 Week
» 70478 Month
» 190005 Year
» 3216858 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
92249 |
on |
10/12/1958 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/12/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 92249 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) |
|
|
18/06/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (83D) |
|
|
08/10/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) |
|
|
06/10/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D) |
|
|
27/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
06/01/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
04/05/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 92249 from Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
09/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Arnott Young: Rawmarsh, Rotherham |
|
|