Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 874 Today
» 1058 Yesterday
» 5448 Week
» 33406 Month
» 68048 Year
» 1289613 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 92250   31/12/1958

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 9F
Company History BR
Wheels 2-10-0
Builder Crewe Works
To Service Tue 31/12/1958 to Banbury (84C)
Withdrawal During 12/1965
Scrapping During 07/1966 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 6 yrs, 10 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
84C Banbury (New) 31/12/1958
86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 28/11/1959
81C Southall 4w/e 30/11/1963
86B Ebbw Junction (Newport) 7w/e 22/06/1964
86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 20/07/1964
85B Gloucester Horton Road 7w/e 07/11/1965
   Withdrawn m/e 12/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW NYA   m/e 31/12/1958
ALLOC 84C Banbury m/e 31/01/1959
ALLOC 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 30/11/1963
ALLOC 86B Ebbw Junction (Newport) 3w/e 29/06/1964
ALLOC 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 3w/e 20/07/1964
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 7w/e 07/11/1965
TOSTORE   3w/e 27/11/1965
WDN   7w/e 16/01/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
31/12/1958 To Service To service as BR Number 92250
Built at Crewe Works
Allocated to Banbury (84C)
   
28/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A)    
30/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
22/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86B)    
20/07/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E)    
07/11/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
12/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 92250    
07/05/1966 Sightings Cashmore's Scrapyard, Newport: Dumped RO 8/1966 Link
07/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev