Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 424 Today
» 1085 Yesterday
» 424 Week
» 22930 Month
» 326120 Year
» 1547685 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway (Orig) 9302 m/e 02/1932
Great Western Railway (1st Renum) 7324 on 19/02/1957

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Churchward
Class 43xx
Company History GWR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
93xx02/1932
43xx19/02/1957
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 276
To Service During 02/1932
Withdrawal Mon 22/10/1962
Service Life 30 yrs, 8 mths , 21 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 02/1932
121 Reading (W.R.) on 01/01/1934
81C Southall 4w/e 31/08/1951
81E Didcot 4w/e 01/11/1952
81F Oxford 8w/e 11/07/1953
81E Didcot 4w/e 04/10/1958
   Withdrawn on 22/10/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 11/08/1951
ALLOC 81E Didcot 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 81F Oxford 4w/e 11/07/1953
ALLOC 81E Didcot 4w/e 04/10/1958
WDN   on 22/10/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/03/1948 Swindon Works Locomotives entering Works during March included: Nos. 1006/16, 1434, 1861, 2943/44, 3015, 3803/53/60, 4012/16/23/26/30/35/77/90/94, 4803, 4941/98, 5006/09/25/59/68/80/97, 5339/50/78, 5901/07/48/83, 6011/13/19/22, 6318/20/22/65, 6903/20/23/42/51, 7001, 9089 an 9302. New work: Nos. 6986-89 and 0-6-0 Diesel-electric No. 15101, the latter with cast brass number plates and 'British Railways' on the sides; also numbers in 3' letters in the centre of the buffer beams. W.D. Nos. 77060/145/280/335, 79244 (all ex repair in Belgium) and 78624 arrived in the Works on 23/3 from Marston sidings. W.D. Nos. 77027 an 77165 are ex Works with G.W. type top feed and Wakefield lubricator. Works' pilots recently have been and are Nos. 198, 250, 410, 1713 an 2781; 905 ceased to work on these duties W/E 13/3 and has gone for scrapping. No. 1358 was in the Works W/E 13/3 for scrapping, while No. 3004 was cut up in the same week. No. 6022 LA went on the test plant on 18/3 for several days and is now being prepared to go to the L.N.E.R. Engines ex Works are now emerging without the prefix W. SLS/194805

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1932 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 9302
Built at Swindon Works
   
01/01/1934 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Reading (W.R.) (121)    
31/08/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
01/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Didcot (81E)    
11/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Oxford (81F)    
19/02/1957 Renumbered Renumbered to 7324    
04/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Didcot (81E)    
22/10/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 7324    

prev prev