Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 26 Online
» 427 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 2873 Week
» 14578 Month
» 346067 Year
» 422654 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR (Orig) 9303   02/1932
GWR (1st Renum) 7325   06/1958

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Churchward
Class 43xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 276
To Service During 02/1932
Withdrawal During 04/1964
Service Life 32 yrs , 2 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
101 Old Oak Common 01/01/1934 (Snapshot)
84E Tyseley 4w/e 25/11/1953
84C Banbury 4w/e 06/10/1956
86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 04/11/1961
86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 08/09/1962
86G Pontypool Road 4w/e 27/07/1963
   Withdrawn m/e 04/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 84E Tyseley 4w/e 28/11/1953
ALLOC 84C Banbury 4w/e 06/10/1956
ALLOC 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 04/11/1961
ALLOC 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 08/09/1962
ALLOC 86G Pontypool Road 4w/e 27/07/1963
WDN   3w/e 04/05/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Static Exhibit
Link www.svr.co.uk/
Status Date 19/03/2011


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1932 To Service To service as GWR Number 9303
Built at Swindon Works
   
01/01/1934 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Old Oak Common (101)    
25/11/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Tyseley (84E)    
06/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Banbury (84C)    
06/1958 Renumbered Renumbered to 7325    
04/11/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A)    
08/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E)    
27/07/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Pontypool Road (86G)    
04/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 7325    

prev prev