Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 130 Today
» 1352 Yesterday
» 7871 Week
» 28313 Month
» 365159 Year
» 1586724 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway (Orig) 9304 m/e 02/1932
Great Western Railway (1st Renum) 7326 m/e 06/1958

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Churchward
Class 43xx
Company History GWR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
93xx02/1932
43xx06/1958
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 276
To Service During 02/1932
Withdrawal Tue 17/09/1963
Scrapping Cohens (Morriston)
Service Life 31 yrs, 7 mths , 17 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 02/1932
41 Didcot on 01/01/1934
81C Southall 4w/e 31/08/1951
86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 19/06/1954
85C Hereford 4w/e 08/10/1955
83C Exeter 4w/e 12/06/1958
85C Hereford 4w/e 09/08/1958
83D Laira 4w/e 25/02/1961
83B Taunton 4w/e 25/03/1961
   Withdrawn on 17/09/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC PDN Old Oak Common 4w/e 16/07/1949
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 11/08/1951
ALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 19/06/1954
ALLOC 85C Hereford 4w/e 08/10/1955
ALLOC 83C Exeter 4w/e 12/07/1958
ALLOC 85C Hereford 4w/e 09/08/1958
ALLOC 83D Laira 4w/e 25/02/1961
ALLOC 83B Taunton 4w/e 25/03/1961
WDN   4w/e 29/09/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/10/1945 Swindon Works Locos entering works during October, 1945: 2184, 2206, 2530/41, 2638, 2805/14/72/3/82/8, 2915/33/46, 3025/36, 3656, 3810/3/66, 4016/7/32/40/4154/618/96, 4517/51/64/80, 4603/17/41/53/65, 4704, 4818/31/6, 4925/9/47, 5065/84, 5208/37, 5312/56/81, 5422, 5508/22/66/72, 5718/23, 5902/21/4/8/9/64 6000/6/9/24, 6116, 6378/9, 6437, 6732/9, 6955, 7214, 7719/26/40, 8741/6, 9304/17, 9702/64. L.M.S. 8402/6/14. L.N.E. K3 17. SLS/194602

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1932 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 9304
Built at Swindon Works
   
01/01/1934 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Didcot (41)    
31/08/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
19/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)    
08/10/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Hereford (85C)    
06/1958 Renumbered Renumbered to 7326    
12/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Exeter (83C)    
09/08/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Hereford (85C)    
25/02/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (83D)    
25/03/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Taunton (83B)    
17/09/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 7326    

prev prev