Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 410 Today
» 1085 Yesterday
» 410 Week
» 22916 Month
» 326106 Year
» 1547671 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway (Orig) 9305 m/e 02/1932
Great Western Railway (1st Renum) 7327 on 28/01/1959

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Churchward
Class 43xx
Company History GWR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
93xx02/1932
43xx28/01/1959
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 276
To Service During 02/1932
Withdrawal Fri 06/11/1964
Service Life 32 yrs, 9 mths , 6 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 02/1932
121 Reading (W.R.) on 01/01/1934
81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 30/11/1950
87H Neyland 4w/e 19/06/1954
81C Southall 4w/e 09/10/1954
84E Tyseley 4w/e 09/08/1958
81E Didcot 4w/e 04/10/1958
   Withdrawn on 06/11/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC PDN Old Oak Common 4w/e 16/07/1949
ALLOC 81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 04/11/1950
ALLOC 87H Neyland 4w/e 19/06/1954
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 09/10/1954
ALLOC 84E Tyseley 4w/e 09/08/1958
ALLOC 81E Didcot 4w/e 04/10/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1932 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 9305
Built at Swindon Works
   
01/01/1934 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Reading (W.R.) (121)    
30/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D)    
19/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Neyland (87H)    
09/10/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
09/08/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Tyseley (84E)    
04/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Didcot (81E)    
28/01/1959 Renumbered Renumbered to 7327    
06/11/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 7327    

prev prev