Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 153 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 6542 Week
» 26984 Month
» 363830 Year
» 1585395 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway (Orig) 9306 m/e 03/1932
Great Western Railway (1st Renum) 7328 m/e 31/05/1958

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Churchward
Class 43xx
Company History GWR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
93xx03/1932
43xx31/05/1958
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 276
To Service During 03/1932
Withdrawal Tue 03/04/1962
Service Life 30 yrs, 1 mth , 5 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 03/1932
101 Old Oak Common on 01/01/1934
81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 31/08/1951
86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 11/08/1956
86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 02/11/1957
   Withdrawn on 03/04/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 11/08/1951
ALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 11/08/1956
ALLOC 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 02/11/1957
WDN   m/e 30/04/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/01/1943 Sheds noted 1/43 2870 ABDR; 8710, 9797 ABG; 3821, 4909, 6835/9, 7800/11 (BAN); 2220, 5025/76, 5564, 6014/7/24, 7802 (BL); 6863 BL/SPM; 4094, 5049, 5970, 6353 (CDF); 5951, 7815 (GLO); 3446, 5060, 6000, 6911 (LA); 6857 (LDR); 5028 (NA); 2636 (NPT); 9317 (OXF); 8302 (OXY); 2881, 4037/89, 4900/98, 5027, 5922/41/96(); 6155, 6902/20, 9306/8 (PDN); 5975 (PPR); 9315 (RDG); 4956, 5566, 6387, 7253 (SDN); 5994 (SLP); 2838/62, 6873 (STJ); 4013/53, 5031, 5957, 6321 (SRD); 5346 (TYS); 5954/99 (TN); 4045, 5406 (WES); 5983, 6877, 6921 (WOS). SLS/194302
28/02/1946 Swindon Works Locos entering works during February: 1499, 1967, 2034/60, 2211/59, 2573, 2753/79, 2803/17/9/41/58/79/96, 2944, 3013/23/30, 3186, 3216, 3737/64, 3865, 4030/49/52/6/73/83/92, 4117, 4231, 4531, 4607/19/38, 4833/56, 4926, 5002/24/42/53/68/77/8, 5151, 4320/36/78 5412/21, 5506/43/68, 5689, 5737, 5912/7/71/83, 6002/18/27, 6105/47/68, 6300/84/7, 6717/37, 6806/66, 6932/8/46, 8719/34/69, 9306, 9768/89/91. Nameplates were affixed to 6938/46. SLS/194605
24/03/1946 Stock Returns No. 92 which has been shown as withdrawn, was transferred to Wellingon in October 1938 and is still there. On 2/3 it appeared to be 100 per cent. intact but for the coupling rods. Assuming that the date of its withdrawal from service coincided with its conversion to a stationary boiler, the official date of 8/42 must be questioned for it has been functioning as such at least since the summer of 1941. No: 92 is not the only locomotive to be so employed, for 1287, which was withdrawn on 9/9/39 and subsequently reinstated, is at Leamington. However although employed for the ,same purpose as 92, and in the same condition, it still remains on the capital list. Mr. Seddon would be grateful for any information as to when 1287 first appeared at Leamington, for how long she was at work as a motive unit and also as to the last time that 92 was actively engaged at Wellington. Regarding the latter this will be co-related with the first appearance there of L.M.S. saddle tank 16027, which is permanently on loan from 4A. 3573/80 shown in the stock returns as 2-4-0T should be entered as 0-4-2T and the relevant totals altered accordingly. SLS/194605
28/02/1946 Swindon Works Locos entering works during February: 1499, 1967, 2034/60, 2211/59, 2573, 2753/79, 2803/17/9/41/58/79/96, 2944, 3013/23/30, 3186, 3216, 3737/64, 3865, 4030/49/52/6/73/83/92, 4117, 4231, 4531, 4607/19/38, 4833/56, 4926, 5002/24/42/53/68/77/8, 5151, 4320/36/78 5412/21, 5506/43/68, 5689, 5737, 5912/7/71/83, 6002/18/27, 6105/47/68, 6300/84/7, 6717/37, 6806/66, 6932/8/46, 8719/34/69, 9306, 9768/89/91. Nameplates were affixed to 6938/46. SLS/194605
31/12/1948 Swindon Works New Work December: Nos. 6766 NEA (8/12), 6767 (21/12), 6768 (23/12); 6993 Arthog Hall WEY (4/12), 6994 Baggrave Hall EXE (9/12), 6995 Benthall Hall TN (17/12). Nos. 6993-95 are painted black and fully lined, while Nos. 6766-68 are black and unlined. Locomotives entering Works 29/11/48 to 24/12/48: These included Nos. 62 (condemned), 71 (condemned), 301 (condemned)-re-numbered from 201, 1020/21/22/24, 1400/07/44, 2068, 2414, 2833/37/94, 3430/31 (both condemned), 3614/74/82, 3724, 3808/17/21/38/59/64, 4038/39/80/90, 4087, 4112/50, 4274, 4353 (condemned), 4506/14/63/70/87, 4700, 4920/91, 5002/34/41/45/47/70/87, 5022, 5103, 5351/59/97, 5412/22, 5522/32, 5708/12, 5913/19/56/59/95, 6010/12/23, 6100/48/54, 6323/24/39/85, 6423, 6856, 6930/39/66, 7200/20/22, 7401, 7727, 9306, 9601/06. (4150 and 5022 were the locomotives that were involved in the Lapworth accident). On 16/12 the Stock Shed contained the following:-Nos. 5, 2906, 3012/15/17/18/23/41/44, 3453, 4017, 4168/69, 4914, 5153/83. Additional locomotives painted black and fully lined include Nos. 5926 an 6947. 'Austerity' No. 77380 has been fitted with a smokebox numberplate (the first 'Austerity' to be so fitted here). 'Austerity' 2-8-0's to be fitted with standard G.W.R. fittings, which include Wakefield lubricator, G.W. type stuffing box and fountain, whistles, injectors, top feed and fire iron compartment, were ex Swindon Works as follows:-Nos. 77000 (19/5/48). 77027 (24/3/48), 77165 (13/4/48), 77291 (10/12/47), 77429 (9/6/48), 78542 (12/11/47), 79226 (6/9/48), 79278 (28/11/47). Frames are being cut for Lot 373. which, it is understood, is for some 0-6-0PT's with outside Walschaerts valve gear. SLS/194902

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1932 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 9306
Built at Swindon Works
   
01/01/1934 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Old Oak Common (101)    
31/08/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D)    
11/08/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)    
02/11/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E)    
31/05/1958 Renumbered Renumbered to 7328    
03/04/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 7328    

prev prev