Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 3206 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16612 Week
» 69628 Month
» 189155 Year
» 3216008 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway (Orig) |
9313 |
m/e |
03/1932 |
Great Western Railway (1st Renum) |
7335 |
m/e |
31/08/1958 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Churchward |
Class |
43xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
276 |
To Service |
During 03/1932 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 10/09/1963 |
Service Life |
31 yrs, 6 mths , 12 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1932 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 9313 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
01/01/1934 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
08/02/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Southall (SHL) |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Reading (W.R.) (RDG) |
|
|
19/06/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neyland (87H) |
|
|
09/10/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Southall (81C) |
|
|
08/10/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B) |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (83D) |
|
|
31/08/1958 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7335 |
|
|
04/11/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B) |
|
|
10/09/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 7335 |
|
|