Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 810 Today
» 1058 Yesterday
» 5384 Week
» 33342 Month
» 67984 Year
» 1289549 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR (Orig) 9316 m/e 04/1932
GWR (1st Renum) 7338 m/e 03/1958

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Churchward
Class 43xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 276
To Service During 04/1932
Withdrawal During 08/1962
Service Life 30 yrs , 4 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
131 Southall 01/01/1934 (Snapshot)
84B Oxley 4w/e 19/06/1954
85A Worcester 4w/e 29/01/1955
85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 26/12/1959
85A Worcester 4w/e 10/09/1960
82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 21/04/1962
   Withdrawn m/e 08/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 84B Oxley 4w/e 19/06/1954
ALLOC 85A Worcester 4w/e 29/01/1955
1STALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 26/12/1959
ALLOC 85A Worcester 4w/e 10/09/1960
ALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 21/04/1962
WDN   m/e 31/08/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1932 To Service To service as GWR Number 9316
Built at Swindon Works
   
01/01/1934 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Southall (131)    
19/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Oxley (84B)    
29/01/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
03/1958 Renumbered Renumbered to 7338    
26/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
10/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
21/04/1962 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
08/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 7338    

prev prev