Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 600 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 6205 Week
» 17752 Month
» 417434 Year
» 494021 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 9400   02/1947

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Hawksworth
Class 94xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 02/1947
Withdrawal During 12/1959
Service Life 12 yrs, 9 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 03/12/1955
   Withdrawn m/e 12/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW SDN Swindon m/e 28/02/1947
ALLOC 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 03/12/1955
WDN   m/e 31/12/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1947 To Service To service as GWR Number 9400
Built at Swindon Works
   
03/12/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
12/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 9400    
12/11/1961 Sightings Swindon Works visit: Around the Works - "A" shop. SLS 1/1962 Link
04/03/1962 Sightings Swindon Works visit.: Around the works. - "A" shop.   Link

prev prev