Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 472 Today
» 1085 Yesterday
» 472 Week
» 22978 Month
» 326168 Year
» 1547733 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 9406 on 10/05/1947

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Hawksworth
Class 94xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 365
To Service Mon 10/05/1947
Withdrawal Mon 28/09/1964
Scrapping During 12/1964
Service Life 17 yrs, 4 mths , 18 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) on 10/05/1947
81B Slough 3w/e 19/05/1951
81C Southall 4w/e 28/09/1963
81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 30/11/1963
   Withdrawn on 28/09/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW PDN Old Oak Common m/e 31/05/1947
ALLOC 81B Slough 4w/e 19/05/1951
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 29/09/1963
ALLOC 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 30/11/1963
WDN   3w/e 05/10/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/05/1947 General New engines reported seen are: Nos. 9405 PDN, 9406 PDN, 9407 PDN, 9408 OXY, 9409 PDN. SLS/194708

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/05/1947 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 9406
Built at Swindon Works
   
19/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Slough (81B)    
28/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
30/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
28/09/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 9406    

prev prev