Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 474 Today
» 1085 Yesterday
» 474 Week
» 22980 Month
» 326170 Year
» 1547735 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 9413 on 31/03/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Hawksworth
Class 94xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number Unk
Works Number 7550
To Service Fri 31/03/1950
Withdrawal Fri 22/11/1963
Scrapping During 11/1963
Service Life 13 yrs, 7 mths , 22 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) on 31/03/1950
81C Southall 4w/e 03/12/1955
   Withdrawn on 22/11/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW NYA   on 27/03/1950
NEW NYA   m/e 31/03/1950
ALLOC 81E Didcot 4w/e 22/04/1950
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 03/12/1955
WDN   4w/e 30/11/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
31/03/1950 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 9413
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 7550
   
03/12/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
22/11/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 9413    

prev prev