Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 507 Today
» 1085 Yesterday
» 507 Week
» 23013 Month
» 326203 Year
» 1547768 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 9415 on 31/05/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Hawksworth
Class 94xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number Unk
Works Number 7552
To Service Thu 31/05/1950
Withdrawal Thu 03/06/1965
Scrapping During 10/1965
Service Life 15 yrs , 3 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) on 31/05/1950
81C Southall 4w/e 11/08/1962
81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 30/11/1963
   Withdrawn on 03/06/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 81B Slough m/e 31/05/1950
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 11/08/1962
ALLOC 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 30/11/1963
TOSTORE   5w/e 12/04/1965
WDN   on 03/06/1965
WDN   4w/e 13/06/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
19/08/1962 Wolverhampton Works (Awaiting works) In Works: 1020, 1630, 3615, 3721, 4636, 4697, 4703, 5181/4, 5564, 6160, 6614/8, 7739, 7816, 8104, 9422/70, 9613/24/6/47/65, 82008; Weigh house: 6156; Awaiting works: 3217, 4938/61, 5065, 5658, 7002, 7824, 9415. SLS/196209
14/10/1962 Wolverhampton Stafford Road Works (Ex-Works on shed) 1628/60, 2841/62, 3217, 3608/58, 3709/15/51/60/78, 4147, 4910/51, 5070, 5245, 5602, 6141, 6644/63/79, 6816, 6982, 7209, 8498, 9411/53, 9608/10/5/40/82. Ex-Works on shed: 9404/15; ex-Works on Oxley MPD; 4697, 7739. 'Kings' at Stafford Road minus numbers and nameplates: 6001/2/7/12/4/5/7/22. SLS/196211

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
31/05/1950 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 9415
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 7552
   
11/08/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
30/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
03/06/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 9415    

prev prev