Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 479 Today
» 1085 Yesterday
» 479 Week
» 22985 Month
» 326175 Year
» 1547740 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 9418 on 31/05/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Hawksworth
Class 94xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number Unk
Works Number 7555
To Service Thu 31/05/1950
Withdrawal Thu 03/06/1965
Scrapping During 10/1965
Service Life 15 yrs , 3 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) on 31/05/1950
81C Southall 3w/e 28/03/1965
   Withdrawn on 03/06/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW NYA   m/e 31/05/1950
ALLOC 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 17/06/1950
ALLOC 81C Southall 5w/e 12/04/1965
TOSTORE   5w/e 16/05/1965
WDN   on 03/06/1965
WDN   4w/e 13/06/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
31/05/1950 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 9418
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 7555
   
28/03/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
03/06/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 9418    

prev prev