Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 507 Today
» 1085 Yesterday
» 507 Week
» 23013 Month
» 326203 Year
» 1547768 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 9422 on 31/07/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Hawksworth
Class 94xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number Unk
Works Number 7559
To Service Sat 31/07/1950
Withdrawal Sat 28/12/1963
Scrapping During 02/1964
Service Life 13 yrs, 4 mths , 27 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) on 31/07/1950
81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 31/08/1950
81C Southall 4w/e 29/11/1958
81B Slough 4w/e 02/12/1961
81C Southall 4w/e 28/09/1963
81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 30/11/1963
   Withdrawn on 28/12/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW NYA   m/e 31/07/1950
ALLOC 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 12/08/1950
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 29/11/1958
ALLOC 81B Slough 4w/e 02/12/1961
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 29/09/1963
ALLOC 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 30/11/1963
WDN   4w/e 31/12/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
19/08/1962 Wolverhampton Works (In Works) In Works: 1020, 1630, 3615, 3721, 4636, 4697, 4703, 5181/4, 5564, 6160, 6614/8, 7739, 7816, 8104, 9422/70, 9613/24/6/47/65, 82008; Weigh house: 6156; Awaiting works: 3217, 4938/61, 5065, 5658, 7002, 7824, 9415. SLS/196209

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
31/07/1950 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 9422
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 7559
   
31/08/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
29/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
02/12/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Slough (81B)    
28/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
30/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
28/12/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 9422    

prev prev