Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 255 Today
» 1267 Yesterday
» 255 Week
» 34830 Month
» 104309 Year
» 1325874 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 9426   30/09/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Hawksworth
Class 94xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
To Service Fri 30/09/1950 to Banbury (84C)
Withdrawal During 05/1965
Scrapping During 08/1965
Service Life 14 yrs , 7 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
84C Banbury (New) 30/09/1950
84E Tyseley 4w/e 21/05/1955
88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 13/08/1955
86C Cardiff Canton m/e 16/06/1956
88L Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 08/09/1962
88L Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 09/02/1963
88C Barry 4w/e 02/11/1963
88B Radyr 6w/e 12/10/1964
   Withdrawn m/e 05/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 84C Banbury 4w/e 09/09/1950
NEW NYA   m/e 30/09/1950
ALLOC 84E Tyseley 4w/e 21/05/1955
ALLOC 88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 13/08/1955
ALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 16/06/1956
ALLOC 88L Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 08/09/1962
ALLOC 88L Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 09/02/1963
ALLOC 88C Barry 5w/e 02/11/1963
ALLOC 88B Radyr 3w/e 14/09/1964
WDN   5w/e 16/05/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
30/09/1950 To Service To service as GWR Number 9426
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Allocated to Banbury (84C)
   
21/05/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Tyseley (84E)    
13/08/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A)    
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)    
08/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88L)    
09/02/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88L)    
02/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
12/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Radyr (88B)    
05/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 9426    

prev prev