Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 1044 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18847 Week
» 71863 Month
» 191390 Year
» 3218243 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
9436 |
on |
18/01/1951 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 06/1961 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/01/1951 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 9436 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 7573 Allocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A) |
|
|
31/01/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A) |
|
|
29/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Fishguard Goodwick (87J) |
|
|
26/01/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A) |
|
|
31/01/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Fishguard Goodwick (87J) |
|
|
29/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A) |
|
|
16/07/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neyland (87H) |
|
|
11/08/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
18/07/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 9436 |
|
|
06/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|