Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 307 Today
» 1267 Yesterday
» 307 Week
» 34882 Month
» 104361 Year
» 1325926 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 9437   31/01/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Hawksworth
Class 94xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
To Service Mon 31/01/1951 to Duffryn Yard (87B)
Withdrawal During 06/1965
Scrapping During 10/1965
Service Life 14 yrs , 4 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
87B Duffryn Yard (New) 31/01/1951
86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 25/01/1958
88C Barry 4w/e 08/09/1962
88L Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 06/10/1962
88L Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 09/02/1963
88C Barry 4w/e 02/11/1963
88A Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 28/12/1963
88B Radyr w/e 08/11/1964
   Withdrawn m/e 06/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW NYA   26/01/1951
ALLOC 87B Duffryn Yard m/e 31/01/1951
ALLOC 88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 01/12/1956
ALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 28/12/1957
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 08/09/1962
ALLOC CED Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 88L Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 09/02/1963
ALLOC 88C Barry 5w/e 02/11/1963
ALLOC 88A Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 31/12/1963
ALLOC 88B Radyr 3w/e 02/11/1964
TOSTORE   5w/e 16/05/1965
WDN   03/06/1965
WDN   4w/e 13/06/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
31/01/1951 To Service To service as GWR Number 9437
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Allocated to Duffryn Yard (87B)
   
25/01/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)    
08/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
06/10/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88L)    
09/02/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88L)    
02/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
28/12/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88A)    
08/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Radyr (88B)    
06/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 9437    

prev prev