Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 435 Today
» 1385 Yesterday
» 1820 Week
» 8625 Month
» 115571 Year
» 1337136 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 9442   31/03/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Hawksworth
Class 94xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
To Service Tue 31/03/1951 to Neath (Court Sart) (87A)
Withdrawal During 07/1964
Scrapping During 12/1964
Service Life 13 yrs, 2 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
87A Neath (Court Sart) (New) 31/03/1951
88C Barry 4w/e 03/11/1962
87A Neath (Court Sart) 2w/e 17/11/1962
   Withdrawn m/e 07/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW NYA   m/e 31/03/1951
ALLOC 87A Neath (Court Sart) m/e 30/04/1951
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 03/11/1962
ALLOC 87A Neath (Court Sart) 2w/e 17/11/1962
WDN   w/e 08/07/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
31/03/1951 To Service To service as GWR Number 9442
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Allocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A)
   
03/11/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
17/11/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A)    
07/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 9442    

prev prev