Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 229 Today
» 1267 Yesterday
» 229 Week
» 34804 Month
» 104283 Year
» 1325848 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 9453   31/07/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Hawksworth
Class 94xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
To Service Sat 31/07/1951
Withdrawal During 11/1964
Scrapping During 03/1965
Service Life 13 yrs , 3 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 31/08/1951
88C Barry 4w/e 06/10/1956
86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 24/01/1959
85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 26/03/1960
85D Bromsgrove 3w/e 04/05/1964
85B Gloucester Horton Road 5w/e 24/08/1964
   Withdrawn m/e 11/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW NYA   m/e 31/07/1951
ALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 11/08/1951
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 06/10/1956
ALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton m/e 28/02/1959
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 26/03/1960
ALLOC 85D Bromsgrove 3w/e 04/05/1964
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 3w/e 10/08/1964
REINS 85B Gloucester Horton Road 3w/e 14/09/1964
WDN   3w/e 14/09/1964
WDN   w/e 02/11/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
31/07/1951 To Service To service as GWR Number 9453
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
   
31/08/1951 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
06/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
24/01/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)    
26/03/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
04/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Bromsgrove (85D)    
24/08/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
11/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 9453    

prev prev