Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 294 Today
» 1267 Yesterday
» 294 Week
» 34869 Month
» 104348 Year
» 1325913 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 9461   31/12/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Hawksworth
Class 94xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
To Service Fri 31/12/1951
Withdrawal During 05/1965
Scrapping During 08/1965
Service Life 13 yrs, 3 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
87B Duffryn Yard 4w/e 31/01/1952
86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 14/08/1954
88L Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 08/09/1962
88C Barry 4w/e 02/11/1963
88B Radyr 6w/e 12/10/1964
   Withdrawn m/e 05/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 87B Duffryn Yard 4w/e 29/12/1951
NEW NYA   m/e 31/12/1951
ALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 14/08/1954
ALLOC 88L Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 08/09/1962
ALLOC 88C Barry 5w/e 02/11/1963
ALLOC 88B Radyr 3w/e 14/09/1964
WDN   5w/e 16/05/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
31/12/1951 To Service To service as GWR Number 9461
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
   
31/01/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Duffryn Yard (87B)    
14/08/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)    
08/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88L)    
02/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
12/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Radyr (88B)    
05/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 9461    

prev prev