Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 429 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 2875 Week
» 14580 Month
» 346069 Year
» 422656 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 9466   29/02/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Hawksworth
Class 94xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
To Service Tue 29/02/1952 to Worcester (85A)
Withdrawal During 07/1964
Service Life 12 yrs, 4 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
85A Worcester (New) 29/02/1952
82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 28/01/1961
88H Tondu 4w/e 14/07/1962
88B Radyr 4w/e 27/07/1963
   Withdrawn m/e 07/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 85A Worcester 4w/e 23/02/1952
NEW NYA   m/e 29/02/1952
ALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 28/01/1961
ALLOC 88H Tondu 4w/e 14/07/1962
ALLOC 88B Radyr 4w/e 27/07/1963
WDN   w/e 08/07/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
29/02/1952 To Service To service as GWR Number 9466
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Allocated to Worcester (85A)
   
28/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
14/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Tondu (88H)    
27/07/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Radyr (88B)    
07/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 9466    

prev prev