Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 437 Today
» 1085 Yesterday
» 437 Week
» 22943 Month
» 326133 Year
» 1547698 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 9469 on 31/03/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Hawksworth
Class 94xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number Unk
Works Number 7620
To Service Mon 31/03/1952 to Llanelly (87F)
Withdrawal Mon 05/03/1962
Scrapping During 06/1962
Service Life 9 yrs, 11 mths , 2 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
87F Llanelly (New) on 31/03/1952
87F Llanelly 4w/e 30/04/1952
81C Southall m/e 16/06/1956
81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 16/05/1959
   Withdrawn on 05/03/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 87F Llanelly 4w/e 22/03/1952
NEW NYA   m/e 31/03/1952
ALLOC 87F Llanelly 4w/e 28/11/1953
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 16/06/1956
ALLOC 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 16/05/1959
WDN   m/e 31/03/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
31/03/1952 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 9469
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 7620
Allocated to Llanelly (87F)
   
30/04/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Llanelly (87F)    
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
16/05/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
05/03/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 9469    

prev prev