Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 233 Today
» 1267 Yesterday
» 233 Week
» 34808 Month
» 104287 Year
» 1325852 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 9472   30/04/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Hawksworth
Class 94xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
To Service Fri 30/04/1952 to Llanelly (87F)
Withdrawal During 05/1965
Scrapping During 08/1965
Service Life 13 yrs

Allocations
Code Name From Date
87F Llanelly (New) 30/04/1952
84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 23/02/1957
88C Barry 4w/e 15/12/1962
88B Radyr 4w/e 09/02/1963
87D Swansea East Dock 3w/e 04/05/1964
87A Neath (Court Sart) 7w/e 22/06/1964
87F Llanelly 4w/e 20/07/1964
   Withdrawn m/e 05/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW NYA   m/e 30/04/1952
ALLOC 87F Llanelly 4w/e 17/05/1952
ALLOC 87F Llanelly 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 87F Llanelly 4w/e 31/10/1953
ALLOC 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 23/02/1957
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 15/12/1962
ALLOC 88B Radyr 4w/e 09/02/1963
ALLOC 87D Swansea East Dock 3w/e 04/05/1964
ALLOC 87A Neath (Court Sart) 3w/e 29/06/1964
ALLOC 87F Llanelly 3w/e 20/07/1964
WDN   5w/e 16/05/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
30/04/1952 To Service To service as GWR Number 9472
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Allocated to Llanelly (87F)
   
23/02/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G)    
15/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
09/02/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Radyr (88B)    
04/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Swansea East Dock (87D)    
22/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A)    
20/07/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Llanelly (87F)    
05/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 9472    

prev prev