Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1500 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19303 Week
» 72319 Month
» 191846 Year
» 3218699 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
9473 |
on |
14/05/1952 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1964 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
14/05/1952 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 9473 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 7624 Allocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A) |
|
|
14/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A) |
|
|
04/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swansea East Dock (87D) |
|
|
22/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A) |
|
|
06/07/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 9473 |
|
|
12/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|