Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 4188 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17594 Week
» 70610 Month
» 190137 Year
» 3216990 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
9476 |
on |
19/06/1952 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
NYA |
|
m/e |
30/06/1952 |
ALLOC |
82C |
Swindon |
4w/e |
12/07/1952 |
ALLOC |
83F |
Truro |
4w/e |
05/09/1959 |
ALLOC |
82C |
Swindon |
4w/e |
28/11/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
30/06/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
19/06/1952 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 9476 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 7627 Allocated to Swindon (82C) |
|
|
12/07/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swindon (82C) |
|
|
05/09/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Truro (83F) |
|
|
28/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swindon (82C) |
|
|
06/06/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 9476 |
|
|
08/1962 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: Morriston |
|
|