Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 542 Today
» 1081 Yesterday
» 2657 Week
» 25163 Month
» 328353 Year
» 1549918 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 9479 on 31/07/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Hawksworth
Class 94xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number Unk
Works Number 7630
To Service Tue 31/07/1952 to Llanelly (87F)
Withdrawal Tue 23/07/1963
Scrapping During 09/1963
Service Life 10 yrs, 11 mths , 22 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
87F Llanelly (New) on 31/07/1952
81C Southall 8w/e 20/04/1957
81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 29/11/1958
   Withdrawn on 23/07/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW NYA   m/e 31/07/1952
ALLOC 87F Llanelly 4w/e 09/08/1952
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 23/03/1957
ALLOC 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 29/11/1958
WDN   4w/e 27/07/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
31/07/1952 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 9479
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 7630
Allocated to Llanelly (87F)
   
20/04/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
29/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
23/07/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 9479    

prev prev