Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 815 Today
» 1058 Yesterday
» 5389 Week
» 33347 Month
» 67989 Year
» 1289554 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 9495   31/10/1954

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Hawksworth
Class 94xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Yorkshire Engine Company
To Service Mon 31/10/1954 to St Philips Marsh (82B)
Withdrawal During 06/1965
Scrapping During 10/1965
Service Life 10 yrs , 7 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
82B St Philips Marsh (New) 31/10/1954
81C Southall 4w/e 02/12/1961
81B Slough 4w/e 19/05/1962
81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 14/07/1962
81C Southall 3w/e 28/03/1965
   Withdrawn m/e 06/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 09/10/1954
NEW NYA   m/e 31/10/1954
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 02/12/1961
ALLOC 81B Slough 4w/e 19/05/1962
ALLOC 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 14/07/1962
ALLOC 81C Southall 5w/e 12/04/1965
TOSTORE   5w/e 16/05/1965
WDN   03/06/1965
WDN   4w/e 13/06/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
31/10/1954 To Service To service as GWR Number 9495
Built at Yorkshire Engine Company
Allocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)
   
02/12/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
19/05/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Slough (81B)    
14/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
28/03/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
06/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 9495    

prev prev