Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1433 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19236 Week
» 72252 Month
» 191779 Year
» 3218632 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D95 |
15/04/1961 |
|
TOPS (45/0) |
45054 |
09/05/1975 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
45 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Split Headcode Box No Gangway |
|
To Service |
15/04/1961 to Derby (17A) |
Withdrawn |
21/01/1985 |
Time in Service |
23 yrs, 9 mths , 6 dys |
Cut Up |
30/11/1985 |
Cut At |
Vic Berry (at Toton MPD) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
11/11/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
15/04/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
11/11/1971 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
11/05/1962 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
13/09/1963 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
22/10/1963 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
04/11/1963 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
15/04/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D95 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
11/11/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
09/05/1975 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45054 |
|
|
21/01/1985 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45054 |
|
|
30/11/1985 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: at Toton MPD |
|
|