Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 497 Today
» 1165 Yesterday
» 5098 Week
» 16645 Month
» 416327 Year
» 492914 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D9521 20/11/1964

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 14
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service 20/11/1964
Withdrawn 03/05/1969
Time in Service 4 yrs, 5 mths , 13 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
81A Old Oak Common (New) 20/11/1964
82A Bristol Bath Road 7w/e 07/11/1965
87E Landore m/e 30/06/1967
   Withdrawn 03/05/1969

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
20/11/1964 To Service To service as D9521
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Old Oak Common (81A)
   
07/11/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
30/06/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Landore (87E)    
03/05/1969 Withdrawn Condemned as D9521    

prev prev