Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 92 Today
» 1085 Yesterday
» 6148 Week
» 20725 Month
» 383970 Year
» 460557 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D9522 25/11/1964

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 14
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service 25/11/1964
Withdrawn 31/12/1967
Time in Service 3 yrs, 1 mth , 6 dys
Cut Up 01/05/1968
Cut At Arnott Young (Parkgate)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
81A Old Oak Common (New) 25/11/1964
82A Bristol Bath Road 7w/e 07/11/1965
87E Landore m/e 30/06/1967
   Withdrawn 31/12/1967


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
25/11/1964 To Service To service as D9522
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Old Oak Common (81A)
   
07/11/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
30/06/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Landore (87E)    
31/12/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as D9522    
01/05/1968 Scrapped Broken up by Arnott Young: Parkgate    

prev prev