Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 228 Today
» 1225 Yesterday
» 228 Week
» 11775 Month
» 411457 Year
» 488044 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D9526 06/01/1965

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 14
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service 06/01/1965
Withdrawn 30/11/1968
Time in Service 3 yrs, 10 mths , 24 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
82A Bristol Bath Road (New) 06/01/1965
86A Cardiff Canton 2w/e 31/05/1967
   Withdrawn 30/11/1968

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
29/11/1964 Sightings Swindon Works visit: Under construction, frames with motors fitted RO 1/1965 Link
06/01/1965 To Service To service as D9526
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)
   
31/05/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A)    
30/11/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as D9526    
31/10/1971 Sightings APCM Houghton Regis works, Dunstable. - Undergoing overhaul and repaint RO 3/1972  

prev prev