Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 106 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 2552 Week
» 14257 Month
» 345746 Year
» 422333 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D9529 26/01/1965

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 14
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service 26/01/1965
Withdrawn 01/04/1968 off Hull Dairycoates (50B)
Time in Service 3 yrs, 2 mths , 6 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
86A Cardiff Canton (New) 26/01/1965
87E Landore 5w/e 16/05/1965
50B Hull Dairycoates 4w/e 20/05/1967
91E To Eastern Region m/e 31/05/1967
   Stored m/e 31/05/1967
   Withdrawn 01/04/1968

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
29/11/1964 Sightings Swindon Works visit: Under construction, frames with motors fitted RO 1/1965 Link
26/01/1965 To Service To service as D9529
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86A)
   
16/05/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Landore (87E)    
20/05/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B)    
31/05/1967 Allocation Reallocated to To Eastern Region (91E)    
31/05/1967 To Store To Store    
01/04/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as D9529 from Hull Dairycoates (50B)    

prev prev