Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 795 Today
» 1165 Yesterday
» 5396 Week
» 16943 Month
» 416625 Year
» 493212 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D9531 02/02/1965

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 14
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service 02/02/1965
Withdrawn 30/12/1967
Time in Service 2 yrs, 10 mths , 28 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
86A Cardiff Canton (New) 02/02/1965
87E Landore 5w/e 16/05/1965
82A Bristol Bath Road 10w/e 15/01/1966
86A Cardiff Canton q/e 15/01/1967
   Withdrawn 30/12/1967

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
29/11/1964 Sightings Swindon Works visit: Under construction, frames with motors fitted RO 1/1965 Link
02/02/1965 To Service To service as D9531
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86A)
   
16/05/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Landore (87E)    
15/01/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
15/01/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A)    
30/12/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as D9531    

prev prev