Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 4694 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 23605 Week
» 88559 Month
» 291223 Year
» 3318076 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D9536 |
16/03/1965 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
16/03/1965 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/03/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D9536 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
16/05/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
15/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
03/05/1969 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 9536 |
|
|
12/1985 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by National Coal Board: Ashington |
|
|